IA HF870 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on April 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-22 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2570.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-22 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2570.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act regarding the registration and titling of motor vehicles, including by providing for initial registration and titling by any county treasurer and by modifying related fees and the amount of fees retained by county treasurers.(Formerly HF 810, HSB 262; See HF 2570.)
Title
A bill for an act regarding the registration and titling of motor vehicles, including by providing for initial registration and titling by any county treasurer and by modifying related fees and the amount of fees retained by county treasurers.(Formerly HF 810, HSB 262; See HF 2570.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-22 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2570. |
2022-03-22 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 627. |
2022-02-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-0 |
2022-02-22 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/23/2022 5:00PM RM 304.1. |
2022-02-22 | House | Subcommittee: Bloomingdale, Isenhart and Nordman. H.J. 345. |
2021-05-20 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. H.J. 1203. |
2021-04-14 | House | Fiscal note. |
2021-04-13 | House | Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. H.J. 940. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB262 (Related) 2021-03-08 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 810.
HF810 (Similar To) 2021-04-13 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 870.
HF2570 (Similar To) 2022-03-28 - Fiscal note.
HF810 (Similar To) 2021-04-13 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 870.
HF2570 (Similar To) 2022-03-28 - Fiscal note.