IA HF86 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-02 - Withdrawn. H.J. 281.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-02 - Withdrawn. H.J. 281.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to voluntary diversity plans under the state's open enrollment law.(See HSB 64, HF 228.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to voluntary diversity plans under the state's open enrollment law.(See HSB 64, HF 228.)
Sponsors
Rep. Dean Fisher [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-02 | House | Withdrawn. H.J. 281. |
2021-01-15 | House | Introduced, referred to Education. H.J. 110. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB64 (Related) 2021-01-27 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 228.
HF228 (Similar To) 2021-05-10 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1098.
HF228 (Similar To) 2021-05-10 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1098.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=HF86 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/HF86.html |