IA HF854 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-13 - Subcommittee: Dawson, Jochum, and Whiting. S.J. 873.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-13 - Subcommittee: Dawson, Jochum, and Whiting. S.J. 873.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act providing for delinquency fees for executive branch agencies for untimely rulemaking in certain circumstances and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions. (Formerly HF 809, HSB 264.)
Title
A bill for an act providing for delinquency fees for executive branch agencies for untimely rulemaking in certain circumstances and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions. (Formerly HF 809, HSB 264.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-06 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 86 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-13 | Senate | Subcommittee: Dawson, Jochum, and Whiting. S.J. 873. |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Ways and Means. S.J. 765. |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 765. |
2021-04-06 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 894. |
2021-05-18 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 1172. |
2021-04-21 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 996. |
2021-04-13 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 951. |
2021-04-06 | House | Passed House, yeas 86, nays 4. H.J. 891. |
2021-04-06 | House | Amendment H-1302 adopted. H.J. 890. |
2021-04-01 | House | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 877. |
2021-03-25 | House | Amendment H-1302 filed. H.J. 855. |
2021-03-24 | House | Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. H.J. 829. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB264 (Related) 2021-03-08 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 809.
HF809 (Similar To) 2021-04-06 - Withdrawn. H.J. 894.
HF809 (Similar To) 2021-04-06 - Withdrawn. H.J. 894.