IA HF853 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-06 - Fiscal note.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-06 - Fiscal note.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to snowmobile user permits and registration fees.(Formerly HF 826, HSB 263.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to snowmobile user permits and registration fees.(Formerly HF 826, HSB 263.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-16 - Senate - Senate State Government Report (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 90 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 90 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-06 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/31/2022 8:30AM Room G17. |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Subcommittee: Brown, Dickey, and Jochum. S.J. 592. |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. S.J. 559. |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Amendment S-5068 filed. S.J. 548. |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. S.J. 548. |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/15/2022 12:00PM Room G17. |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Subcommittee reassigned: Brown, Giddens, and R. Smith. S.J. 502. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Subcommittee: R. Smith, Cournoyer, and Giddens. S.J. 935. |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Read first time, referred to State Government. S.J. 878. |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 878. |
2021-04-13 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 950. |
2021-05-18 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 1173. |
2021-04-22 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 1000. |
2021-04-21 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 996. |
2021-04-14 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 962. |
2021-04-13 | House | Passed House, yeas 90, nays 1. H.J. 949. |
2021-03-24 | House | Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. H.J. 829. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB263 (Related) 2021-03-11 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 826.
HF826 (Similar To) 2021-04-13 - Withdrawn. H.J. 950.
HF826 (Similar To) 2021-04-13 - Withdrawn. H.J. 950.