IA HF844 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-08 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1211.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-08 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1211.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act providing for business entities, providing for certain fees, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly HF 681, HSB 39.) Effective date: Enactment, 01/01/2022, 07/01/2021.
Title
A bill for an act providing for business entities, providing for certain fees, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly HF 681, HSB 39.) Effective date: Enactment, 01/01/2022, 07/01/2021.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-05 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-08 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 1211. |
2021-05-24 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 1207. |
2021-06-10 | House | Fiscal note. |
2021-05-05 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 1042. |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 1038. |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 48, nays 0. S.J. 1037. |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Substituted for SF 579. S.J. 1036. |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Read first time, attached to similar SF 579. S.J. 878. |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 878. |
2021-04-13 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 950. |
2021-05-18 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 1173. |
2021-04-22 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 1000. |
2021-04-21 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 996. |
2021-04-14 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 962. |
2021-04-13 | House | Passed House, yeas 92, nays none. H.J. 943. |
2021-04-13 | House | Amendment H-1355 adopted. H.J. 942. |
2021-04-06 | House | Amendment H-1355 filed. H.J. 895. |
2021-04-01 | House | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 877. |
2021-03-22 | House | Fiscal note. |
2021-03-17 | House | Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. H.J. 744. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB39 (Related) 2021-02-24 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 681.
SSB1056 (Related) 2021-02-04 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 266.
SF266 (Similar To) 2021-03-15 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 579. S.J. 601.
HF681 (Similar To) 2021-04-13 - Withdrawn. H.J. 950.
SF579 (Similar To) 2021-05-05 - Withdrawn. S.J. 1037.
SSB1056 (Related) 2021-02-04 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 266.
SF266 (Similar To) 2021-03-15 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 579. S.J. 601.
HF681 (Similar To) 2021-04-13 - Withdrawn. H.J. 950.
SF579 (Similar To) 2021-05-05 - Withdrawn. S.J. 1037.