IA HF841 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-13 - Fiscal note.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-13 - Fiscal note.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act increasing the size of an estate exempt from the state inheritance tax, and establishing a future repeal of the state inheritance tax.
Title
A bill for an act increasing the size of an estate exempt from the state inheritance tax, and establishing a future repeal of the state inheritance tax.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-13 | House | Fiscal note. |
2021-03-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. Vote Total: 3-0 |
2021-03-29 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/29/2021 12:30PM House Lounge 2. |
2021-03-18 | House | Subcommittee: Bloomingdale, Hite and Jacoby. H.J. 756. |
2021-03-17 | House | Introduced, referred to Ways and Means. H.J. 743. |