IA HF833 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-05 - Withdrawn. H.J. 811.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-05 - Withdrawn. H.J. 811.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to rental agreements for manufactured home communities and mobile home parks.(Formerly HF 442; See HF 2441, HF 2562.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to rental agreements for manufactured home communities and mobile home parks.(Formerly HF 442; See HF 2441, HF 2562.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-05 | House | Withdrawn. H.J. 811. |
2022-02-14 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2441. |
2022-02-14 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 261. |
2022-02-09 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0 |
2022-02-04 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/09/2022 12:00PM RM 103, Sup. Ct. Chamber. |
2022-01-26 | House | Subcommittee: Lohse, Holt and Wilburn. H.J. 130. |
2021-04-15 | House | Referred to Judiciary. H.J. 965. |
2021-03-29 | House | Amendment H-1325 filed. H.J. 867. |
2021-03-11 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 705. |
Same As/Similar To
HF442 (Similar To) 2022-04-05 - Withdrawn. H.J. 811.
SF403 (Similar To) 2021-02-24 - Subcommittee: Dawson, Bisignano, and Schultz. S.J. 455.
HF2441 (Similar To) 2022-04-05 - Withdrawn. H.J. 811.
HF2562 (Similar To) 2022-05-17 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 877.
SF403 (Similar To) 2021-02-24 - Subcommittee: Dawson, Bisignano, and Schultz. S.J. 455.
HF2441 (Similar To) 2022-04-05 - Withdrawn. H.J. 811.
HF2562 (Similar To) 2022-05-17 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 877.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=HF833 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/HF833.html |