IA HF819 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-08 - Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 842.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-08 - Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 842.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to fundamental parental rights. (Formerly HF 714.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to fundamental parental rights. (Formerly HF 714.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-01 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Report (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-08 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 842. |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 734. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/30/2021 2:00PM RM 24A. |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Subcommittee: Zaun, Bisignano, and Reichman. S.J. 711. |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Judiciary. S.J. 686. |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 686. |
2021-03-25 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 854. |
2021-03-25 | House | Passed House, yeas 94, nays none. H.J. 842. |
2021-03-25 | House | Amendment H-1299 adopted. H.J. 842. |
2021-03-25 | House | Amendment H-1299 filed. H.J. 841. |
2021-03-25 | House | Amendment H-1287 adopted, as amended. H.J. 841. |
2021-03-25 | House | Amendment H-1299 to amendment H-1287 filed, adopted. H.J. 841. |
2021-03-24 | House | Amendment H-1287 filed. H.J. 833. |
2021-03-11 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 703. |
Same As/Similar To
HF714 (Similar To) 2021-03-25 - Withdrawn. H.J. 854.