IA HF818 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-29 - Subcommittee: Sinclair, Boulton, and Whiting. S.J. 711.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-29 - Subcommittee: Sinclair, Boulton, and Whiting. S.J. 711.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the restoration of voting rights to certain convicted persons and including effective date provisions.(Formerly HSB 231.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the restoration of voting rights to certain convicted persons and including effective date provisions.(Formerly HSB 231.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-24 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 67 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-29 | Senate | Subcommittee: Sinclair, Boulton, and Whiting. S.J. 711. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Judiciary. S.J. 681. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 681. |
2021-03-24 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 828. |
2021-03-24 | House | Passed House, yeas 67, nays 28. H.J. 795. |
2021-03-11 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 703. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB231 (Related) 2021-03-11 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 818.