IA HF815 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-15 - Referred to State Government. H.J. 965.
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-15 - Referred to State Government. H.J. 965.
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to executive orders of the president of the United States.(Formerly HF 481.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to executive orders of the president of the United States.(Formerly HF 481.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-15 | House | Referred to State Government. H.J. 965. |
2021-03-25 | House | Amendments H-1322, H-1323 and H-1324 filed. H.J. 856. |
2021-03-25 | House | Amendments H-1307, H-1308, H-1309, H-1310, H-1311, H-1312, H-1313, H-1314, H-1315, H-1316, H-1317, H-1318, H-1319, H-1320 and H-1321 filed. H.J. 855. |
2021-03-23 | House | Amendment H-1254 filed. H.J. 779. |
2021-03-15 | House | Amendments H-1208 and H-1209 filed. H.J. 731. |
2021-03-09 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 648. |
Same As/Similar To
HF481 (Similar To) 2021-12-31 - END OF [] ACTIONS
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=HF815 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/HF815.html |