IA HF809 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-06 - Withdrawn. H.J. 894.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-06 - Withdrawn. H.J. 894.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act providing for delinquency fees for executive branch agencies for untimely rulemaking in certain circumstances and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions.(Formerly HSB 264; See HF 854.)
Title
A bill for an act providing for delinquency fees for executive branch agencies for untimely rulemaking in certain circumstances and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions.(Formerly HSB 264; See HF 854.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-06 | House | Withdrawn. H.J. 894. |
2021-03-24 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 832. |
2021-03-24 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 854. |
2021-03-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0 |
2021-03-16 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/17/2021 7:45AM RM 103, Sup. Ct. Chamber. |
2021-03-10 | House | Subcommittee: Kaufmann, Gjerde and Graber. H.J. 699. |
2021-03-08 | House | Introduced, referred to Ways and Means. H.J. 619. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB264 (Related) 2021-03-08 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 809.
HF854 (Similar To) 2021-04-13 - Subcommittee: Dawson, Jochum, and Whiting. S.J. 873.
HF854 (Similar To) 2021-04-13 - Subcommittee: Dawson, Jochum, and Whiting. S.J. 873.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=HF809 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/HF809.html |