IA HF802 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-08 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1211.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act providing for requirements related to racism or sexism trainings at, and diversity and inclusion efforts by, governmental agencies and entities, school districts, and public postsecondary educational institutions. (Formerly HSB 258.) Effective date: 07/01/2021.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act providing for requirements related to racism or sexism trainings at, and diversity and inclusion efforts by, governmental agencies and entities, school districts, and public postsecondary educational institutions. (Formerly HSB 258.) Effective date: 07/01/2021.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-06 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 53 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 30 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - Senate Education Report (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 59 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - Shall amendment H–1207, as amended, be adopted? (Y: 59 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-08SenateSigned by Governor. H.J. 1211.
2021-05-20SenateReported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 1207.
2021-05-07SenateMessage from House. S.J. 1046.
2021-05-06HouseImmediate message. H.J. 1076.
2021-05-18HouseExplanation of vote. H.J. 1174.
2021-05-13HouseExplanation of vote. H.J. 1100.
2021-05-06HousePassed House, yeas 53, nays 35. H.J. 1046.
2021-05-06HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendment H-1428. H.J. 1045.
2021-05-06HousePoint of order raised, Rule 10, decorum in debate, ruled point well taken. H.J. 1045.
2021-04-28HouseSenate amendment H-1428 filed. H.J. 1033.
2021-04-28HouseMessage from Senate. H.J. 1023.
2021-04-28SenateImmediate message. S.J. 980.
2021-04-28SenatePassed Senate, yeas 30, nays 18. S.J. 976.
2021-04-28SenateAmendment S-3176 filed, adopted. S.J. 976.
2021-04-28SenateAmendment S-3169 withdrawn. S.J. 976.
2021-04-27SenateAmendment S-3169 filed. S.J. 962.
2021-04-08SenatePlaced on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 842.
2021-03-30SenateCommittee report, recommending passage. S.J. 717.
2021-03-23SenateSubcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
2021-03-18SenateSubcommittee Meeting: 03/23/2021 1:30PM 217 Conference Room.
2021-03-18SenateSubcommittee: Sinclair, Quirmbach, and J. Taylor. S.J. 640.
2021-03-17SenateRead first time, referred to Education. S.J. 608.
2021-03-17SenateMessage from House. S.J. 608.
2021-03-16HouseImmediate message. H.J. 737.
2021-03-16HousePassed House, yeas 59, nays 38. H.J. 737.
2021-03-16HouseAmendment H-1207 adopted, as amended. H.J. 736.
2021-03-16HousePoint of order raised, Rule 10, decorum in debate, Speaker resolved the point of order. H.J. 735.
2021-03-16HousePoint of order raised, Rule 10, decorum in debate, Speaker resolved the point of order. H.J. 735.
2021-03-16HousePoint of order raised, Rule 10, decorum in debate, Speaker resolved the point of order. H.J. 734.
2021-03-16HousePoint of order raised, Rule 10, decorum in debate, ruled point not well taken. H.J. 734.
2021-03-16HouseMotion to suspend rules prevailed. H.J. 734.
2021-03-16HouseMotion to suspend rules for immediate consideration of amendment H-1207 as amended. H.J. 734.
2021-03-16HousePoint of order raised on amendment H-1207 as amended, ruled not germane. H.J. 734.
2021-03-16HouseAmendment H-1213 to amendment H-1207 filed, adopted. H.J. 734.
2021-03-15HouseAmendment H-1207 filed. H.J. 731.
2021-03-08HouseIntroduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 618.

Same As/Similar To

HSB258 (Related) 2021-03-08 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 802.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback