IA HF802 | 2009-2010 | 83rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 19 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-01-07 - * * * * * END OF 2009 ACTIONS * * * * *
Status: Introduced on March 19 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-01-07 - * * * * * END OF 2009 ACTIONS * * * * *
Summary
A bill for an act providing for public comment regarding an application to construct a confinement feeding operation structure. (Formerly HSB 168)
Title
A bill for an act providing for public comment regarding an application to construct a confinement feeding operation structure. (Formerly HSB 168)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-07 | * * * * * END OF 2009 ACTIONS * * * * * | |
2009-04-14 | Referred to Environmental Protection. H.J. 1448. | |
2009-03-24 | Amendment H-1278 filed. H.J. 1029. | |
2009-03-19 | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 890. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://coolice.legis.state.ia.us/Cool-ICE/default.asp?Category=BillInfo&Service=DspHistory&var=HF&key=0855C&ga=83 |