IA HF800 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 8 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Withdrawn. H.J. 567.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to the operation of registered all-terrain vehicles and off-road utility vehicles on highways.(Formerly HSB 245; See HF 2130.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to the operation of registered all-terrain vehicles and off-road utility vehicles on highways.(Formerly HSB 245; See HF 2130.)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-03-14HouseWithdrawn. H.J. 567.
2022-01-26HouseCommittee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2130.
2022-01-25HouseCommittee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 134.
2022-01-19HouseSubcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-0
2022-01-12HouseSubcommittee Meeting: 01/18/2022 12:00PM RM 103, Sup. Ct. Chamber.
2022-01-12HouseSubcommittee: Kaufmann, Cohoon and Mitchell. H.J. 67.
2021-04-15HouseReferred to State Government. H.J. 965.
2021-03-08HouseIntroduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 617.

Same As/Similar To

HSB245 (Related) 2021-03-08 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 800.
HF2130 (Similar To) 2022-04-25 - Amendment S-5142 filed. S.J. 814.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback