IA HF794 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-07 - Withdrawn. H.J. 910.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-07 - Withdrawn. H.J. 910.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the practice of pharmacy, including the prescription and administration of vaccines and collaborative pharmacy practice.(Formerly HSB 91.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the practice of pharmacy, including the prescription and administration of vaccines and collaborative pharmacy practice.(Formerly HSB 91.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-07 | House | Withdrawn. H.J. 910. |
2021-04-07 | House | SF 296 substituted. H.J. 904. |
2021-04-07 | House | Amendment H-1349 adopted. H.J. 904. |
2021-04-06 | House | Amendment H-1349 filed. H.J. 895. |
2021-04-01 | House | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 877. |
2021-03-08 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 616. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB91 (Related) 2021-03-08 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 794.
SSB1095 (Related) 2021-02-09 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 296.
SF296 (Similar To) 2021-05-19 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1140.
SSB1095 (Related) 2021-02-09 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 296.
SF296 (Similar To) 2021-05-19 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1140.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=HF794 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/HF794.html |