IA HF785 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-10 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1099.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-10 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1099.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to amusement concessions. (Formerly HSB 210.) Effective date: 07/01/2021.
Title
A bill for an act relating to amusement concessions. (Formerly HSB 210.) Effective date: 07/01/2021.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-21 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Senate State Government Report (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Senate State Government Report (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-10 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 1099. |
2021-05-10 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 1098. |
2021-04-22 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 999. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 923. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 45, nays 1. S.J. 922. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 842. |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 736. |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 04/01/2021 12:00PM RM 24A. |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Subcommittee: Dawson, Bisignano, and R. Smith. S.J. 711. |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Read first time, referred to State Government. S.J. 686. |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 686. |
2021-03-25 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 854. |
2021-03-25 | House | Passed House, yeas 95, nays none. H.J. 846. |
2021-03-25 | House | Amendment H-1247 adopted. H.J. 845. |
2021-03-23 | House | Amendment H-1247 filed. H.J. 779. |
2021-03-22 | House | Fiscal note. |
2021-03-05 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 610. |
Same As/Similar To
SF345 (Similar To) 2021-02-22 - Subcommittee Meeting: 02/25/2021 10:00AM RM 24A.
HSB210 (Related) 2021-03-05 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 785.
HSB210 (Related) 2021-03-05 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 785.