IA HF785 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on April 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-27 - Referred to Appropriations. H.J. 1076.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-27 - Referred to Appropriations. H.J. 1076.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to rural economic development by providing tax incentives for high-quality jobs in rural communities. (Formerly HSB 252.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to rural economic development by providing tax incentives for high-quality jobs in rural communities. (Formerly HSB 252.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-27 | House | Referred to Appropriations. H.J. 1076. |
2019-04-24 | House | Introduced, placed on Appropriations calendar. H.J. 985. |
Same As/Similar To
HF468 (Similar To) 2019-03-04 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
HSB252 (Related) 2019-04-23 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 983.
HSB252 (Related) 2019-04-23 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 983.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=HF785 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/HF785.html |