IA HF775 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1039.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act concerning unauthorized entry or access, including placement or use of a camera or electronic surveillance device while trespassing, unauthorized gathering of samples of certain materials relating to animals and animal feeding operations, and providing penalties. (Formerly HF 78.) Effective date: 07/01/2021.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act concerning unauthorized entry or access, including placement or use of a camera or electronic surveillance device while trespassing, unauthorized gathering of samples of certain materials relating to animals and animal feeding operations, and providing penalties. (Formerly HF 78.) Effective date: 07/01/2021.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-12 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 72 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 35 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Senate - Senate Commerce Report (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 72 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-30HouseSigned by Governor. H.J. 1039.
2021-04-30HouseReported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 1037.
2021-06-08HouseFiscal note.
2021-04-13HouseMessage from House. S.J. 856.
2021-04-12SenateImmediate message. H.J. 936.
2021-05-18SenateExplanation of vote. H.J. 1173.
2021-04-22SenateExplanation of vote. H.J. 999.
2021-04-21SenateExplanation of vote. H.J. 996.
2021-04-14SenateExplanation of vote. H.J. 962.
2021-04-12SenatePassed House, yeas 72, nays 20. H.J. 929.
2021-04-12SenateHouse concurred in Senate amendment H-1358. H.J. 928.
2021-04-07SenateSenate amendment H-1358 filed. H.J. 917.
2021-04-07SenateMessage from Senate. H.J. 897.
2021-04-06HouseImmediate message. S.J. 764.
2021-04-06HousePassed Senate, yeas 35, nays 11. S.J. 762.
2021-04-06HouseAmendment S-3117 adopted. S.J. 761.
2021-04-05HouseAmendment S-3117 filed. S.J. 741.
2021-04-05HouseCommittee report, recommending amendment and passage. S.J. 740.
2021-03-30HouseSubcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
2021-03-29HouseSubcommittee Meeting: 03/30/2021 1:00PM 217 Conference Room.
2021-03-29HouseSubcommittee: Brown, Bisignano, and Sinclair. S.J. 711.
2021-03-29HouseReferred to Commerce. S.J. 710.
2021-03-29HouseFiscal note.
2021-03-29HouseSubcommittee recommends passage.
2021-03-25HouseSubcommittee Meeting: 03/29/2021 12:30PM RM 24A.
2021-03-29HouseSubcommittee: Shipley, Kinney, and Zumbach. S.J. 711.
2021-03-24HouseRead first time, referred to Agriculture. S.J. 675.
2021-03-24HouseRead first time, referred to Agriculture. S.J. 675.
2021-03-24HouseMessage from House. S.J. 675.
2021-03-24SenateMessage from House. S.J. 675.
2021-03-23HouseImmediate message. H.J. 776.
2021-03-23HousePassed House, yeas 72, nays 24. H.J. 768.
2021-03-23HouseAmendment H-1162 adopted, as amended. H.J. 767.
2021-03-23HouseAmendment H-1248 to amendment H-1162 filed, adopted. H.J. 767.
2021-03-10HouseAmendment H-1162 filed. H.J. 701.
2021-03-10HouseFiscal note.
2021-03-05HouseIntroduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 609.

Same As/Similar To

HF78 (Similar To) 2021-03-24 - Withdrawn. H.J. 780.

Iowa State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=HF775
Texthttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/HF775.html
Texthttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGR/89/attachments/HF775.html
Texthttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGE/89/attachments/HF775.html
Supplementhttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/FN/1216764.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/FN/1218229.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/FN/1220449.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/HJNL/20210323_HJNL.pdf#767
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/SJNL/20210405_SJNL.pdf#741
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/SJNL/20210406_SJNL.pdf#762
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/HJNL/20210412_HJNL.pdf#929

Bill Comments

feedback