IA HF773 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on April 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-24 - Withdrawn. H.J. 1011.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-24 - Withdrawn. H.J. 1011.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act establishing budget limitations for counties and cities and including applicability provisions. (Formerly HSB 165.)
Title
A bill for an act establishing budget limitations for counties and cities and including applicability provisions. (Formerly HSB 165.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-24 | House | Withdrawn. H.J. 1011. |
2019-04-24 | House | SF 634 substituted. H.J. 1005. |
2019-04-24 | House | Amendment H-1300 filed, adopted. H.J. 1005. |
2019-04-23 | House | Fiscal note. |
2019-04-11 | House | Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. H.J. 812. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB165 (Related) 2019-04-10 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 811.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=HF773 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/HF773.html |