IA HF771 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-05 - Subcommittee reassigned: Chapman, Jochum, and R. Smith. S.J. 218.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-05 - Subcommittee reassigned: Chapman, Jochum, and R. Smith. S.J. 218.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the child and dependent care and early childhood development tax credits, and including applicability provisions. (Formerly HF 227.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the child and dependent care and early childhood development tax credits, and including applicability provisions. (Formerly HF 227.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-25 - House - Passed House (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passed House (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passed House (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-05 | Senate | Subcommittee reassigned: Chapman, Jochum, and R. Smith. S.J. 218. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Subcommittee: Feenstra, Jochum, and R. Smith. S.J. 1165. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Ways and Means. S.J. 1131. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 1131. |
2019-04-25 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 1036. |
2019-04-25 | House | Passed House, yeas 97 nays 1. H.J. 1035. |
2019-04-25 | House | Asked and received unanimous consent for immediate consideration. H.J. 1029. |
2019-04-16 | House | Fiscal note. |
2019-04-09 | House | Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. H.J. 769. |
Same As/Similar To
HF227 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - Withdrawn. H.J. 1042.