IA HF768 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-20 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1210.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-20 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1210.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act concerning licensing of and sales by native distilleries, beer manufacturers, native breweries, and native wine manufacturers. (Formerly HSB 60.) Effective date: 07/01/2021.
Title
A bill for an act concerning licensing of and sales by native distilleries, beer manufacturers, native breweries, and native wine manufacturers. (Formerly HSB 60.) Effective date: 07/01/2021.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-28 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Senate State Government Report (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Senate State Government Report (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-20 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 1210. |
2021-05-20 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 1207. |
2021-04-28 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 1022. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 980. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 47, nays 1. S.J. 975. |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 842. |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 735. |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/31/2021 2:30PM 217 Conference Room. |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Subcommittee: Koelker, Bisignano, and Cournoyer. S.J. 711. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Read first time, referred to State Government. S.J. 681. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 681. |
2021-03-24 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 828. |
2021-03-24 | House | Passed House, yeas 95, nays none. H.J. 789. |
2021-03-24 | House | Amendment H-1151 adopted. H.J. 788. |
2021-03-08 | House | Amendment H-1151 filed. H.J. 647. |
2021-03-05 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 608. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB60 (Related) 2021-03-05 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 768.