IA HF768 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1084.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1084.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to agricultural development, by providing for the Iowa finance authority, a beginning farmer tax credit program, fees, and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions. (Formerly HF 647 and HSB 173.) Effective 5-21-19.
Title
A bill for an act relating to agricultural development, by providing for the Iowa finance authority, a beginning farmer tax credit program, fees, and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions. (Formerly HF 647 and HSB 173.) Effective 5-21-19.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-25 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - Passed House (Y: 99 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - Passed House (Y: 99 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-21 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 1084. |
2019-05-02 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 1079. |
2019-04-25 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 1016. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 1124. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 49, nays 0. S.J. 1120. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Substituted for SF 624. S.J. 1120. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Read first time and attached to similar SF 624. S.J. 1100. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 1100. |
2019-04-24 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 996. |
2019-04-24 | House | Passed House, yeas 99 nays 1. H.J. 993. |
2019-04-24 | House | Amendment H-1214 withdrawn. H.J. 992. |
2019-04-24 | House | Amendment H-1275 adopted. H.J. 991. |
2019-04-24 | House | Amendments H-1291 and H-1292 to H-1275 withdrawn. H.J. 991. |
2019-04-24 | House | Amendments H-1291 and H-1292 to H-1275 filed. H.J. 991. |
2019-04-23 | House | Amendment H-1275 filed. H.J. 983. |
2019-04-15 | House | Amendment H-1214 filed. H.J. 859. |
2019-04-15 | House | Fiscal note. |
2019-04-04 | House | Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. H.J. 754. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB173 (Related) 2019-02-26 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 364.
SSB1181 (Related) 2019-02-21 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
SF444 (Similar To) 2019-04-17 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 624. S.J. 1009.
HF647 (Similar To) 2019-04-24 - Withdrawn. H.J. 996.
SF624 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - Withdrawn. S.J. 1120.
SSB1181 (Related) 2019-02-21 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
SF444 (Similar To) 2019-04-17 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 624. S.J. 1009.
HF647 (Similar To) 2019-04-24 - Withdrawn. H.J. 996.
SF624 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - Withdrawn. S.J. 1120.