IA HF767 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-15 - Referred to Human Resources. H.J. 965.
Pending: House Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-15 - Referred to Human Resources. H.J. 965.
Pending: House Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to participating network provider pharmacies and pharmacists under Medicaid managed care.(Formerly HSB 224.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to participating network provider pharmacies and pharmacists under Medicaid managed care.(Formerly HSB 224.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-15 | House | Referred to Human Resources. H.J. 965. |
2021-03-15 | House | Amendment H-1205 filed. H.J. 731. |
2021-03-10 | House | Amendment H-1160 filed. H.J. 701. |
2021-03-05 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 608. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB224 (Related) 2021-03-05 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 767.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=HF767 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/HF767.html |