IA HF765 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1084.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1084.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to and making appropriations to state departments and agencies from the rebuild Iowa infrastructure fund and the technology reinvestment fund, providing for related matters, and including effective date and applicability provisions. (Formerly HSB 251.) Effective 7-1-19, with exception of Division III effective 5-13-19.
Title
A bill for an act relating to and making appropriations to state departments and agencies from the rebuild Iowa infrastructure fund and the technology reinvestment fund, providing for related matters, and including effective date and applicability provisions. (Formerly HSB 251.) Effective 7-1-19, with exception of Division III effective 5-13-19.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-23 - House - Passed House (Y: 54 N: 45 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 36 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - Passed House (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passed House (Y: 54 N: 45 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 36 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - Passed House (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 36 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - Passed House (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passed House (Y: 54 N: 45 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 36 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - Passed House (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-13 | Senate | Signed by Governor. H.J. 1084. |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 1079. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | NOBA: Final |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 1078. |
2019-04-23 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 979. |
2019-04-24 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 1012. |
2019-04-23 | House | Passed House, yeas 54 nays 45. H.J. 967. |
2019-04-23 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment H-1267. H.J. 967. |
2019-04-23 | House | Point of order raised, Rule 10, decorum in debate, ruled point well taken. H.J. 966. |
2019-04-22 | House | NOBA: Senate Floor |
2019-04-22 | House | Senate amendment H-1267 filed. H.J. 947. |
2019-04-22 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 929. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 1040. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 36, nays 13. S.J. 1040. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Amendment S-3174 out of order. S.J. 1040. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Amendment S-3195 adopted, as amended. S.J. 1040. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Amendment S-3197 to S-3195 filed, adopted. S.J. 1039. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Amendment S-3195 filed. S.J. 1039. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | NOBA: Senate Full Approps |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Amendment S-3174 filed. S.J. 987. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. S.J. 987. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | NOBA: House Floor |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Subcommittee: Johnson, Boulton, Dawson, Lykam, and R. Smith. S.J. 927. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Appropriations. S.J. 911. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 911. |
2019-04-09 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 794. |
2019-04-09 | House | Passed House, yeas 100 nays none. H.J. 772. |
2019-04-09 | House | Amendment H-1149 adopted, as amended. H.J. 771. |
2019-04-09 | House | Amendment H-1161 to H-1149 lost. H.J. 771. |
2019-04-09 | House | Amendment H-1161 to H-1149 filed. H.J. 770. |
2019-04-09 | House | Amendment H-1160 to H-1149 filed, adopted. H.J. 770. |
2019-04-09 | House | Amendment H-1159 to H-1149 filed, withdrawn. H.J. 770. |
2019-04-09 | House | Amendment H-1163 to H-1151 filed, ruled out of order. H.J. 770. |
2019-04-09 | House | Amendment H-1151 withdrawn. H.J. 770. |
2019-04-08 | House | Amendment H-1151 filed. H.J. 767. |
2019-04-08 | House | Amendment H-1149 filed. H.J. 767. |
2019-04-08 | House | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 763. |
2019-04-05 | House | NOBA: House Full Approps |
2019-04-04 | House | Introduced, placed on Appropriations calendar. H.J. 754. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB251 (Related) 2019-04-04 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 758.