IA HF761 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-19 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1201.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-19 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1201.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the local fire protection and emergency medical service providers grant program. (Formerly HSB 247.) Effective date: 07/01/2021.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the local fire protection and emergency medical service providers grant program. (Formerly HSB 247.) Effective date: 07/01/2021.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-06 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-19 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 1201. |
2021-05-19 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 1200. |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 764. |
2021-04-06 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 894. |
2021-05-18 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 1172. |
2021-04-21 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 996. |
2021-04-13 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 951. |
2021-04-06 | House | Passed House, yeas 90, nays none. H.J. 886. |
2021-04-06 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment H-1245. H.J. 885. |
2021-04-01 | House | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 877. |
2021-03-23 | House | Senate amendment H-1245 filed. H.J. 779. |
2021-03-23 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 765. |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 663. |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 48, nays 0. S.J. 661. |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Amendment S-3091 filed, adopted. S.J. 660. |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Substituted for SF 569. S.J. 660. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Read first time, attached to similar SF 569. S.J. 577. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 577. |
2021-03-10 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 697. |
2021-03-10 | House | Passed House, yeas 97, nays none. H.J. 693. |
2021-03-05 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 607. |
Same As/Similar To
SF438 (Similar To) 2021-03-08 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 569. S.J. 554.
HSB247 (Related) 2021-03-05 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 761.
SF569 (Similar To) 2021-03-22 - Withdrawn. S.J. 661.
HSB247 (Related) 2021-03-05 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 761.
SF569 (Similar To) 2021-03-22 - Withdrawn. S.J. 661.