IA HF757 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-10 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1099.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-10 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1099.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to driver's license restrictions, including ignition interlock device requirements for a first operating-while-intoxicated offense. (Formerly HSB 251.) Effective date: 07/01/2021.
Title
A bill for an act relating to driver's license restrictions, including ignition interlock device requirements for a first operating-while-intoxicated offense. (Formerly HSB 251.) Effective date: 07/01/2021.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-28 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Report (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Report (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-10 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 1099. |
2021-05-10 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 1098. |
2021-04-28 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 1022. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 975. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 48, nays 0. S.J. 974. |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 842. |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 734. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/24/2021 1:30PM RM 24A. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Subcommittee: Schultz, Bisignano, and Shipley. S.J. 604. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Judiciary. S.J. 576. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 576. |
2021-03-10 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 697. |
2021-03-10 | House | Passed House, yeas 97, nays none. H.J. 688. |
2021-03-05 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 606. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB251 (Related) 2021-03-05 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 757.