IA HF753 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-20 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1210.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-20 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1210.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to unintentionally causing the death of a person by operating a motor vehicle at an excessive speed, providing penalties, and making penalties applicable. (Formerly HSB 5.) Effective date: 07/01/2021.
Title
A bill for an act relating to unintentionally causing the death of a person by operating a motor vehicle at an excessive speed, providing penalties, and making penalties applicable. (Formerly HSB 5.) Effective date: 07/01/2021.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-05 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Report (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Report (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-20 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 1210. |
2021-05-20 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 1207. |
2021-06-11 | House | Fiscal note. |
2021-05-05 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 1042. |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 1036. |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 48, nays 0. S.J. 1034. |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 842. |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 734. |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/29/2021 12:30PM 217 Conference Room. |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Subcommittee: Whiting, Bisignano, and Reichman. S.J. 677. |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Judiciary. S.J. 675. |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 675. |
2021-03-23 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 776. |
2021-03-23 | House | Passed House, yeas 96, nays none. H.J. 775. |
2021-03-23 | House | Amendment H-1211 withdrawn. H.J. 774. |
2021-03-23 | House | Amendment H-1210 adopted. H.J. 774. |
2021-03-15 | House | Amendments H-1210 and H-1211 filed. H.J. 731. |
2021-03-09 | House | Fiscal note. |
2021-03-05 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 606. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB5 (Related) 2021-03-05 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 753.