IA HF739 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1038.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1038.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to statutory corrections which may adjust language to reflect current practices, insert earlier omissions, delete redundancies and inaccuracies, delete temporary language, resolve inconsistencies and conflicts, update ongoing provisions, or remove ambiguities, and including retroactive applicability provisions. (Formerly HSB 236.) Effective date: 07/01/2021. Applicability date: 05/10/2019, 06/25/2020, 06/29/2020.
Title
A bill for an act relating to statutory corrections which may adjust language to reflect current practices, insert earlier omissions, delete redundancies and inaccuracies, delete temporary language, resolve inconsistencies and conflicts, update ongoing provisions, or remove ambiguities, and including retroactive applicability provisions. (Formerly HSB 236.) Effective date: 07/01/2021. Applicability date: 05/10/2019, 06/25/2020, 06/29/2020.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-07 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 1038. |
2021-04-30 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 1037. |
2021-04-07 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 911. |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 836. |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 44, nays 0. S.J. 829. |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Substituted for SF 520. S.J. 829. |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 725. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Read first time, attached to similar SF 520. S.J. 575. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 575. |
2021-03-09 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 679. |
2021-03-10 | House | Explanations of votes. H.J. 698. |
2021-03-09 | House | Passed House, yeas 93, nays none. H.J. 677. |
2021-03-09 | House | Committee amendment H-1124 adopted. H.J. 676. |
2021-03-04 | House | Committee amendment H-1124 filed. H.J. 603. |
2021-03-03 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 590. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1212 (Related) 2021-03-01 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 520.
HSB236 (Related) 2021-03-03 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 739.
SF520 (Similar To) 2021-04-07 - Withdrawn. S.J. 830.
HSB236 (Related) 2021-03-03 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 739.
SF520 (Similar To) 2021-04-07 - Withdrawn. S.J. 830.