IA HF737 | 2009-2010 | 83rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 16 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-01-07 - * * * * * END OF 2009 ACTIONS * * * * *
Status: Introduced on March 16 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-01-07 - * * * * * END OF 2009 ACTIONS * * * * *
Summary
A bill for an act allowing school districts affected by a presidentially declared major disaster or a state of disaster emergency to use the previous year's budget enrollments in certain current budget years after the disaster, and providing an effective date. (Formerly HF 427)
Title
A bill for an act allowing school districts affected by a presidentially declared major disaster or a state of disaster emergency to use the previous year's budget enrollments in certain current budget years after the disaster, and providing an effective date. (Formerly HF 427)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-07 | * * * * * END OF 2009 ACTIONS * * * * * | |
2009-03-20 | Fiscal note. HCS. | |
2009-03-17 | Amendment H-1182 filed. H.J. 850. | |
2009-03-16 | Introduced, referred to Education. H.J. 806. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://coolice.legis.state.ia.us/Cool-ICE/default.asp?Category=BillInfo&Service=DspHistory&var=HF&key=0789C&ga=83 |