IA HF736 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-17 - Withdrawn. H.J. 899.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-17 - Withdrawn. H.J. 899.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act providing for notarial acts, including by providing for the use of electronic media, providing penalties, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly HSB 167.)
Title
A bill for an act providing for notarial acts, including by providing for the use of electronic media, providing penalties, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly HSB 167.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-17 | House | Withdrawn. H.J. 899. |
2019-04-17 | House | SF 475 substituted. H.J. 893. |
2019-04-04 | House | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 757. |
2019-04-02 | House | Amendment H-1106 filed. H.J. 714. |
2019-03-13 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 538. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1116 (Related) 2019-02-12 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
HSB167 (Related) 2019-03-07 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 470.
SF475 (Similar To) 2019-04-29 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1196.
HSB167 (Related) 2019-03-07 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 470.
SF475 (Similar To) 2019-04-29 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1196.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=HF736 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/HF736.html |