IA HF732 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 7 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to the medical cannabidiol Act. (Formerly HSB 244.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to the medical cannabidiol Act. (Formerly HSB 244.)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-27 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 40 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - Passed House (Y: 96 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 40 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-07HouseReported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor.
2019-04-27HouseMessage from Senate. H.J. 1075.
2019-04-27SenateImmediate message. S.J. 1177.
2019-04-27SenatePassed Senate, yeas 40, nays 7. S.J. 1176.
2019-04-27SenateAmendment S-3124 lost. S.J. 1176.
2019-04-11SenatePlaced on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 931.
2019-04-04SenateAmendment S-3124 filed. S.J. 862.
2019-04-04SenateCommittee report, recommending amendment and passage. S.J. 862.
2019-03-27SenateSubcommittee: Zaun, Sinclair, and R. Taylor. S.J. 774.
2019-03-27SenateRead first time, referred to Judiciary. S.J. 755.
2019-03-27SenateMessage from House. S.J. 755.
2019-03-26HouseImmediate message. H.J. 652.
2019-03-26HousePassed House, yeas 96, nays 3. H.J. 651.
2019-03-26HouseAmendment H-1074 adopted, as amended. H.J. 651.
2019-03-26HouseAmendment H-1080 to H-1074 filed, adopted. H.J. 651.
2019-03-26HouseAmendment H-1079 to H-1074 filed, withdrawn. H.J. 650.
2019-03-26HouseAmendment H-1073 withdrawn. H.J. 650.
2019-03-25HouseAmendments H-1073 and H-1074 filed. H.J. 625.
2019-03-20HouseFiscal note.
2019-03-13HouseIntroduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 529.

Same As/Similar To

HSB244 (Related) 2019-03-07 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 470.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback