IA HF728 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-21 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 852.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-21 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 852.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to noncompliance with rules adopted by a county sanitarian regarding septic tank pumping. (Formerly HSB 222.) Effective date: 07/01/2022.
Title
A bill for an act relating to noncompliance with rules adopted by a county sanitarian regarding septic tank pumping. (Formerly HSB 222.) Effective date: 07/01/2022.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-28 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 28 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 83 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 83 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-21 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 852. |
2022-04-21 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 851. |
2022-02-28 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 434. |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 415. |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 28, nays 17. S.J. 415. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 957. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 04/20/2021 8:30AM RM 24A. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Subcommittee: Sweeney, Green, and Quirmbach. S.J. 891. |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Rereferred to Ways and Means. S.J. 727. |
2021-03-27 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/29/2021 12:00PM RM 24A. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Subcommittee: Driscoll, J. Smith, and Williams. S.J. 683. |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Local Government. S.J. 675. |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 675. |
2021-03-23 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 776. |
2021-03-23 | House | Passed House, yeas 83, nays 13. H.J. 774. |
2021-03-03 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 573. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB222 (Related) 2021-03-03 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 728.
SSB1274 (Related) 2021-04-28 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 616.
SF616 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
SSB1274 (Related) 2021-04-28 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 616.
SF616 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Subcommittee recommends passage.