IA HF728 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-18 - Withdrawn. H.J. 922.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-18 - Withdrawn. H.J. 922.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to controlled substances, including amending information collection and reporting requirements under the Iowa prescription monitoring program, amending the controlled substance schedules, removing certain references to marijuana, making penalties applicable, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly HSB 140.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to controlled substances, including amending information collection and reporting requirements under the Iowa prescription monitoring program, amending the controlled substance schedules, removing certain references to marijuana, making penalties applicable, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly HSB 140.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-18 | House | Withdrawn. H.J. 922. |
2019-04-18 | House | SF 572 substituted. H.J. 919. |
2019-04-18 | House | Amendment H-1226 adopted. H.J. 919. |
2019-04-16 | House | Amendment H-1226 filed. H.J. 885. |
2019-04-04 | House | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 757. |
2019-03-13 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 528. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB140 (Related) 2019-03-06 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 421.
SSB1230 (Related) 2019-03-04 - Subcommittee Meeting: 03/05/2019 3:45PM RM 315.
SF572 (Similar To) 2019-04-19 - Message from House, with amendment S-3190. S.J. 1025.
SSB1230 (Related) 2019-03-04 - Subcommittee Meeting: 03/05/2019 3:45PM RM 315.
SF572 (Similar To) 2019-04-19 - Message from House, with amendment S-3190. S.J. 1025.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=HF728 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/HF728.html |