IA HF727 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 13 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-27 - Referred to Human Resources. H.J. 1076.
Pending: House Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to the prescribing and dispensing of self-administered hormonal contraceptives. (Formerly HSB 214.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to the prescribing and dispensing of self-administered hormonal contraceptives. (Formerly HSB 214.)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-27HouseReferred to Human Resources. H.J. 1076.
2019-04-15HouseAmendment H-1211 filed. H.J. 859.
2019-04-04HousePlaced on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 757.
2019-04-01HouseAmendment H-1100 filed. H.J. 709.
2019-03-13HouseIntroduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 528.

Same As/Similar To

HSB214 (Related) 2019-03-06 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 419.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback