IA HF726 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-26 - Subcommittee: Segebart, Carlin, and Quirmbach. S.J. 751.
Pending: Senate Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-26 - Subcommittee: Segebart, Carlin, and Quirmbach. S.J. 751.
Pending: Senate Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to certain health and human services-related entities including membership, reimbursement, and the elimination or combining of such entities. (Formerly HF 549.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to certain health and human services-related entities including membership, reimbursement, and the elimination or combining of such entities. (Formerly HF 549.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-20 - House - Passed House (Y: 77 N: 20 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passed House (Y: 77 N: 20 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passed House (Y: 77 N: 20 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-26 | Senate | Subcommittee: Segebart, Carlin, and Quirmbach. S.J. 751. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Human Resources. S.J. 698. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 698. |
2019-03-20 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 598. |
2019-03-25 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 622. |
2019-03-20 | House | Passed House, yeas 77, nays 20. H.J. 596. |
2019-03-20 | House | Amendment H-1043 adopted. H.J. 596. |
2019-03-19 | House | Amendment H-1043 filed. H.J. 586. |
2019-03-13 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 528. |
Same As/Similar To
HF549 (Similar To) 2019-03-20 - Withdrawn. H.J. 598.