IA HF719 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1083.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1083.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to participation in conciliation related to a dissolution of marriage. (Formerly HF 544.) Effective 7-1-19.
Title
A bill for an act relating to participation in conciliation related to a dissolution of marriage. (Formerly HF 544.) Effective 7-1-19.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-18 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - House - Passed House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - House - Passed House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-01 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 1083. |
2019-04-29 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 1079. |
2019-04-18 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 904. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 1019. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 49, nays 0. S.J. 1017. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 931. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 839. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Subcommittee: Garrett, Kinney, and Nunn. S.J. 695. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Judiciary. S.J. 670. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 670. |
2019-03-19 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 582. |
2019-03-19 | House | Passed House, yeas 97, nays none. H.J. 581. |
2019-03-12 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 502. |
Same As/Similar To
HF544 (Similar To) 2019-03-19 - Withdrawn. H.J. 582.