IA HF716 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-18 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 789.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to firearms requirements for hunting deer. (Formerly HF 179.) Effective date: 07/01/2020.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to firearms requirements for hunting deer. (Formerly HF 179.) Effective date: 07/01/2020.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-10 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 37 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - Passed House (Y: 57 N: 40 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passed House (Y: 57 N: 40 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-18HouseSigned by Governor. H.J. 789.
2020-06-16HouseReported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 788.
2020-06-10HouseMessage from Senate. H.J. 685.
2020-06-10SenateImmediate message. S.J. 736.
2020-06-10SenatePassed Senate, yeas 37, nays 13. S.J. 736.
2020-06-10SenateAmendment S-5122 filed, lost. S.J. 735.
2020-02-18SenateCommittee report, recommending passage. S.J. 342.
2020-02-12SenateSubcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
2020-02-10SenateSubcommittee Meeting: 02/11/2020 4:30PM RM 315.
2019-03-25SenateSubcommittee: Cournoyer, Celsi, and Shipley. S.J. 728.
2019-03-21SenateRead first time, referred to Natural Resources and Environment. S.J. 698.
2019-03-21SenateMessage from House. S.J. 698.
2019-03-20HouseImmediate message. H.J. 598.
2019-03-25HouseExplanation of vote. H.J. 622.
2019-03-20HousePassed House, yeas 57, nays 40. H.J. 595.
2019-03-20HouseAmendment H-1044 adopted. H.J. 595.
2019-03-25HouseExplanation of vote. H.J. 622.
2019-03-20HouseAmendment H-1059 lost. H.J. 595.
2019-03-19HouseAmendment H-1059 filed. H.J. 587.
2019-03-19HouseAmendment H-1044 filed. H.J. 586.
2019-03-12HouseIntroduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 499.

Same As/Similar To

HF179 (Similar To) 2019-03-20 - Withdrawn. H.J. 598.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback