IA HF712 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-11 - Subcommittee: Dawson, Goodwin, and Jochum. S.J. 596.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-11 - Subcommittee: Dawson, Goodwin, and Jochum. S.J. 596.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the construction of child care facilities by providing developers with sales and use tax refunds and income, franchise, moneys and credits, and gross premiums tax credits, providing for a fee, and including applicability provisions.(Formerly HF 362, HF 2.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the construction of child care facilities by providing developers with sales and use tax refunds and income, franchise, moneys and credits, and gross premiums tax credits, providing for a fee, and including applicability provisions.(Formerly HF 362, HF 2.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-09 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 87 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-11 | Senate | Subcommittee: Dawson, Goodwin, and Jochum. S.J. 596. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Ways and Means. S.J. 574. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 574. |
2021-03-09 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 661. |
2021-03-10 | House | Explanations of votes. H.J. 698. |
2021-03-09 | House | Passed House, yeas 87, nays 6. H.J. 657. |
2021-03-03 | House | Fiscal note. |
2021-03-01 | House | Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. H.J. 561. |
Same As/Similar To
HF2 (Similar To) 2021-03-09 - Withdrawn. H.J. 679.
SF122 (Similar To) 2021-01-26 - Subcommittee: Dawson, Goodwin, and Petersen. S.J. 160.
HF362 (Similar To) 2021-03-09 - Withdrawn. H.J. 679.
SF122 (Similar To) 2021-01-26 - Subcommittee: Dawson, Goodwin, and Petersen. S.J. 160.
HF362 (Similar To) 2021-03-09 - Withdrawn. H.J. 679.