IA HF703 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-01 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1042.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-01 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1042.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the Hoover presidential library tax credit available against the individual and corporate income taxes, the franchise tax, the insurance premiums tax, and the moneys and credits tax. (Formerly HSB 123.) Effective date: 07/01/2023.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the Hoover presidential library tax credit available against the individual and corporate income taxes, the franchise tax, the insurance premiums tax, and the moneys and credits tax. (Formerly HSB 123.) Effective date: 07/01/2023.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-03 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Ways And Means Report (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Ways And Means Report (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-01 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 1042. |
2023-05-12 | House | Fiscal note. |
2023-05-09 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 1038. |
2023-05-03 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 984. |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 1047. |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 48, nays 0. S.J. 1046. |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 962. |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. []. |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 04/24/2023 12:00PM Room 217 Conference Room. |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Subcommittee: Zaun, Dawson, and Jochum. S.J. 918. |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Ways and Means. S.J. 860. |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 860. |
2023-04-19 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 886. |
2023-04-20 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 901. |
2023-04-19 | House | Passed House, yeas 95, nays 0. H.J. 883. |
2023-04-11 | House | Fiscal note. |
2023-04-10 | House | Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. H.J. 782. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB123 (Related) 2023-04-10 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 703.