IA HF700 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-26 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1043.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act establishing a dairy innovation fund and program to be administered by the department of agriculture and land stewardship. (Formerly HF 580, HSB 155.) Effective date: 07/01/2023.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act establishing a dairy innovation fund and program to be administered by the department of agriculture and land stewardship. (Formerly HF 580, HSB 155.) Effective date: 07/01/2023.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-05-02 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Report (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-13 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-13 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Appropriations Report (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-26HouseSigned by Governor. H.J. 1043.
2023-05-09HouseReported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 1038.
2023-05-02HouseMessage from Senate. H.J. 976.
2023-05-02SenateImmediate message. S.J. 1031.
2023-05-02SenatePassed Senate, yeas 47, nays 1. S.J. 1029.
2023-04-27SenateNOBA: Senate Full Approps
2023-04-26SenateCommittee report, recommending passage. S.J. 985.
2023-04-25SenateSubcommittee reassigned: Zumbach, Giddens, and Kraayenbrink. S.J. 961.
2023-04-24SenateSubcommittee recommends passage. [].
2023-04-21SenateSubcommittee Meeting: 04/24/2023 12:00PM Room 315.
2023-04-19SenateSubcommittee: Kraayenbrink, Giddens, and Zumbach. S.J. 894.
2023-04-18SenateReferred to Appropriations. S.J. 844.
2023-04-17SenateRead first time, passed on file. S.J. 779.
2023-04-17SenateMessage from House. S.J. 779.
2023-04-14HouseNOBA: House Floor
2023-04-13HouseImmediate message. H.J. 860.
2023-04-13HousePassed House, yeas 98, nays 1. H.J. 857.
2023-04-12HouseNOBA: House Full Approps
2023-04-10HouseIntroduced, placed on Appropriations calendar. H.J. 781.

Same As/Similar To

HSB155 (Related) 2023-03-02 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 580.
HF580 (Similar To) 2023-04-13 - Withdrawn. H.J. 860.

Iowa State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=HF700
Texthttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/HF700.html
Texthttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGE/90/attachments/HF700.html
Supplementhttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/NOBA/1371573.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/NOBA/1371749.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/NOBA/1373669.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/HJNL/20230413_HJNL.pdf#857
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/SJNL/20230426_SJNL.pdf#985
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/SJNL/20230502_SJNL.pdf#1029
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/HJNL/20230413_HJNL.pdf#856
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/SJNL/20230502_SJNL.pdf#1028
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/SJNL/1445225.pdf#985
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/SJNL/1445225.pdf#1028
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/SJNL/1445225.pdf#1029

Bill Comments

feedback