IA HF695 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-27 - Rereferred to State Government. H.J. 1076.
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to the practice of barbering and cosmetology arts and sciences and providing transition provisions. (Formerly HSB 231.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to the practice of barbering and cosmetology arts and sciences and providing transition provisions. (Formerly HSB 231.)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-27HouseRereferred to State Government. H.J. 1076.
2019-04-04HousePlaced on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 757.
2019-03-11HouseIntroduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 481.

Same As/Similar To

SF418 (Similar To) 2019-03-11 - Reported out of committee as SF 582. S.J. 530.
HSB231 (Related) 2019-03-07 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 470.
SF582 (Similar To) 2019-04-27 - Referred to State Government. S.J. 1191.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback