IA HF69 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-11 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1147.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-11 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1147.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to criminal trespass and modifying penalties. Effective 7-1-17.
Title
A bill for an act relating to criminal trespass and modifying penalties. Effective 7-1-17.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-19 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - House - Passed House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - House - Passed House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-13 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 44 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - House - Passed House (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 44 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - House - Passed House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - House - Passed House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-13 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 44 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - House - Passed House (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 44 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-11 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 1147. |
2017-04-25 | House | Sent to Governor. H.J. 1147. |
2017-04-25 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President. H.J. 1147. |
2017-04-20 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 1100. |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 1093. |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 49, nays 1. S.J. 1090. |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Senate concurred with S-3350. S.J. 1089. |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Message from House, with amendment S-3350. S.J. 1063. |
2017-04-18 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 1074. |
2017-04-18 | House | Passed House, ayes 97, nays 0. H.J. 1058. |
2017-04-18 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment H-1340, as amended. H.J. 1057. |
2017-04-18 | House | Amendment H-1373 to Senate amendment H-1340 adopted. H.J. 1057. |
2017-04-17 | House | Amendment H-1373 filed. H.J. 1037. |
2017-04-13 | House | Senate amendment H-1340 filed. H.J. 1012. |
2017-04-13 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 999. |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 1010. |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 44, nays 5. S.J. 1008. |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Amendment S-3317 filed, adopted. S.J. 1007. |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Amendment S-3318 filed, adopted. S.J. 1006. |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 930. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 801. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Subcommittee: Shipley, Bisignano, and Sinclair. S.J. 559. |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Judiciary. S.J. 517. |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 517. |
2017-03-07 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 540. |
2017-03-08 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 563. |
2017-03-07 | House | Passed House, ayes 95, nays 0. H.J. 529. |
2017-03-07 | House | Committee amendment H-1013 adopted. H.J. 529. |
2017-02-15 | House | Fiscal note. |
2017-02-06 | House | Amendment H-1013 filed. H.J. 237. |
2017-02-06 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 237. |
2017-01-24 | House | Subcommittee: Heartsill, Hinson and Wessel-Kroeschell. H.J. 116. |
2017-01-23 | House | Introduced, referred to Judiciary. H.J. 104. |