IA HF687 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-04 - Referred to State Government. H.J. 755.
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-04 - Referred to State Government. H.J. 755.
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to permissible honoraria from restricted donors to public officials and public employees. (Formerly HF 320.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to permissible honoraria from restricted donors to public officials and public employees. (Formerly HF 320.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-04 | House | Referred to State Government. H.J. 755. |
2019-03-12 | House | Amendment H-1019 filed. H.J. 526. |
2019-03-11 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 479. |
Same As/Similar To
HF320 (Similar To) 2019-03-06 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 422.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=HF687 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/HF687.html |