IA HF686 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-27 - Referred to Judiciary. H.J. 1076.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to expert witness testimony in child sexual abuse and child endangerment cases. (Formerly HSB 19.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to expert witness testimony in child sexual abuse and child endangerment cases. (Formerly HSB 19.)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-27HouseReferred to Judiciary. H.J. 1076.
2019-04-04HousePlaced on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 757.
2019-03-11HouseIntroduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 479.

Same As/Similar To

SSB1016 (Related) 2019-02-06 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
HSB19 (Related) 2019-03-07 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 467.
SF329 (Similar To) 2019-04-27 - Rereferred to Judiciary. H.J. 1076.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback