IA HF681 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-13 - Withdrawn. H.J. 950.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-13 - Withdrawn. H.J. 950.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act providing for business entities, providing for certain fees, and including effective date provisions.(Formerly HSB 39; See HF 844.)
Title
A bill for an act providing for business entities, providing for certain fees, and including effective date provisions.(Formerly HSB 39; See HF 844.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-13 | House | Withdrawn. H.J. 950. |
2021-03-17 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 844. |
2021-03-16 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 738. |
2021-03-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0 |
2021-03-01 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/02/2021 12:00PM RM 102, Sup. Ct. Consult. |
2021-02-25 | House | Subcommittee: Lohse, Hite and Wolfe. H.J. 556. |
2021-02-24 | House | Introduced, referred to Ways and Means. H.J. 537. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB39 (Related) 2021-02-24 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 681.
SSB1056 (Related) 2021-02-04 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 266.
SF266 (Similar To) 2021-03-15 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 579. S.J. 601.
SF579 (Similar To) 2021-05-05 - Withdrawn. S.J. 1037.
HF844 (Similar To) 2021-06-08 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1211.
SSB1056 (Related) 2021-02-04 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 266.
SF266 (Similar To) 2021-03-15 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 579. S.J. 601.
SF579 (Similar To) 2021-05-05 - Withdrawn. S.J. 1037.
HF844 (Similar To) 2021-06-08 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1211.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=HF681 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/HF681.html |