IA HF679 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to statutory corrections which may adjust language to reflect current practices, insert earlier omissions, delete redundancies and inaccuracies, delete temporary language, resolve inconsistencies and conflicts, update ongoing provisions, or remove ambiguities, and including retroactive applicability provisions. (Formerly HSB 203.) Effective 7-1-19.
Title
A bill for an act relating to statutory corrections which may adjust language to reflect current practices, insert earlier omissions, delete redundancies and inaccuracies, delete temporary language, resolve inconsistencies and conflicts, update ongoing provisions, or remove ambiguities, and including retroactive applicability provisions. (Formerly HSB 203.) Effective 7-1-19.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-15 - House - Passed House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - Passed House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - Passed House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-01 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 1079. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 965. |
2019-04-15 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 858. |
2019-04-17 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 899. |
2019-04-15 | House | Passed House, yeas 97 nays none. H.J. 854. |
2019-04-15 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment H-1164. H.J. 854. |
2019-04-09 | House | Senate amendment H-1164 filed. H.J. 796. |
2019-04-09 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 768. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 905. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 48, nays 0. S.J. 905. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Amendment S-3140 filed, adopted. S.J. 904. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Substituted for SF 546. S.J. 904. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 857. |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Read first time and attached to similar SF 546. S.J. 743. |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 743. |
2019-03-26 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 646. |
2019-03-26 | House | Passed House, yeas 97, nays none. H.J. 642. |
2019-03-11 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 478. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1172 (Related) 2019-02-25 - Subcommittee Meeting: 02/27/2019 1:00PM Senate Lobbyist Lounge.
HSB203 (Related) 2019-03-06 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 420.
SF546 (Similar To) 2019-04-09 - Withdrawn. S.J. 905.
HSB203 (Related) 2019-03-06 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 420.
SF546 (Similar To) 2019-04-09 - Withdrawn. S.J. 905.