IA HF678 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-15 - Referred to Public Safety. H.J. 965.
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-15 - Referred to Public Safety. H.J. 965.
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to probation.(Formerly HSB 6.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to probation.(Formerly HSB 6.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-15 | House | Referred to Public Safety. H.J. 965. |
2021-03-25 | House | Amendment H-1304 filed. H.J. 855. |
2021-03-02 | House | Fiscal note. |
2021-02-23 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 507. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB6 (Related) 2021-02-18 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 490.