IA HF665 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-12 - Subcommittee, Quirmbach, Schoenjahn, and Sinclair. S.J. 47.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-12 - Subcommittee, Quirmbach, Schoenjahn, and Sinclair. S.J. 47.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act establishing the categorical state percent of growth. (Formerly HSB 253)
Title
A bill for an act establishing the categorical state percent of growth. (Formerly HSB 253)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-02 - House - Passed House (Y: 51 N: 39 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-12 | Senate | Subcommittee, Quirmbach, Schoenjahn, and Sinclair. S.J. 47. |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Education. S.J. 1052. |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 1052. |
2015-06-02 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 1117. |
2015-06-02 | House | Passed House, ayes 51, nays 39. H.J. 1111. |
2015-05-26 | House | Fiscal note. HCS. |
2015-05-20 | House | Introduced, placed on Appropriations calendar. H.J. 1077. |