IA HF662 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Read first time, attached to similar SF 375. S.J. 589.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Read first time, attached to similar SF 375. S.J. 589.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act concerning jurors, relating to access to certain department of revenue taxpayer information for jury list compilation and juror information confidentiality, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly HSB 178.)
Title
A bill for an act concerning jurors, relating to access to certain department of revenue taxpayer information for jury list compilation and juror information confidentiality, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly HSB 178.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - House - Passed House (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | Senate | Read first time, attached to similar SF 375. S.J. 589. |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 589. |
2020-03-10 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 564. |
2020-03-10 | House | Passed House, yeas 100, nays none. H.J. 538. |
2020-03-10 | House | Amendment H-8106 adopted. H.J. 538. |
2020-03-09 | House | Amendment H-8106 filed. H.J. 534. |
2020-01-30 | House | Placed on calendar. H.J. 174. |
2020-01-30 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 174. |
2020-01-21 | House | Passed subcommittee. |
2020-01-15 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/21/2020 12:00PM House Lounge. |
2020-01-15 | House | Subcommittee: Hite, Paustian and Wilburn. H.J. 79. |
2019-04-27 | House | Referred to Judiciary. H.J. 1076. |
2019-04-04 | House | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 756. |
2019-03-08 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 473. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1159 (Related) 2019-02-21 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
HSB178 (Related) 2019-03-05 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 405.
SF375 (Similar To) 2020-03-11 - Attached to similar HF 662. S.J. 589.
HSB178 (Related) 2019-03-05 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 405.
SF375 (Similar To) 2020-03-11 - Attached to similar HF 662. S.J. 589.