IA HF659 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-02 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1188.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-02 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1188.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to and making appropriations to certain state departments, agencies, funds, and certain other entities, providing for regulatory authority, and other properly related matters. Effective 7-2-15.
Title
A bill for an act relating to and making appropriations to certain state departments, agencies, funds, and certain other entities, providing for regulatory authority, and other properly related matters. Effective 7-2-15.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-04 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 26 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-04 - House - Passed House (Y: 57 N: 34 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-06 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 26 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-30 - House - Passed House (Y: 55 N: 41 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-04 - House - Passed House (Y: 57 N: 34 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-06 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 26 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-30 - House - Passed House (Y: 55 N: 41 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-02 | Senate | Signed by Governor. H.J. 1188. |
2015-06-15 | Senate | Sent to Governor. H.J. 1186. |
2015-06-15 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President. H.J. 1186. |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Message from Senate. H.J. 1142. |
2015-06-04 | House | Immediate message. S.J. 1091. |
2015-06-04 | House | Passed Senate, ayes 26, nays 24. S.J. 1090. |
2015-06-04 | House | Conference committee report filed and adopted. S.J. 1089. |
2015-06-04 | House | Message from House. S.J. 1088. |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Immediate message. H.J. 1139. |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Explanations of votes. H.J. 1150. |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Passed House, ayes 57, nays 34. H.J. 1137. |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted. H.J. 1136. |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Conference committee report filed. H.J. 1135. |
2015-05-11 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 1008. |
2015-05-11 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 1039. |
2015-05-11 | House | House conference committee appointed Landon, Sieck, Vander Linden, Hunter, and Kelley. H.J. 1039. |
2015-05-11 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 1038. |
2015-05-11 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 1007. |
2015-05-11 | Senate | Senate conference committee appointed, Brase, Allen, Danielson, Guth, and Zumbach. S.J. 1006. |
2015-05-11 | Senate | Senate insisted. S.J. 1006. |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 1003. |
2015-05-06 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 1031. |
2015-05-06 | House | House refused to concur in Senate amendment H-1338. H.J. 1028. |
2015-05-06 | House | Senate amendment H-1338. H.J. 1027. |
2015-05-06 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 1025. |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 983. |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 26, nays 23. S.J. 981. |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Amendment S-3151 as amended, adopted. S.J. 981. |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Amendment S-3160 filed, adopted. S.J. 981. |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Amendment S-3151 filed. S.J. 961. |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. S.J. 961. |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Appropriations. S.J. 958. |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 958. |
2015-04-30 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 952. |
2015-04-30 | House | Passed House, ayes 55, nays 41. H.J. 951. |
2015-04-30 | House | Speaker ruled point well taken. H.J. 950. |
2015-04-30 | House | Point of order raised Rule 10, decorum in debate. H.J. 950. |
2015-04-30 | House | Speaker ruled point well taken. H.J. 950. |
2015-04-30 | House | Point of order raised Rule 10, decorum in debate. H.J. 950. |
2015-04-30 | House | Motion to suspend rules failed. H.J. 950. |
2015-04-30 | House | Motion to suspend rules to consider amendment H-1274. H.J. 949. |
2015-04-30 | House | Ruled not germane amendment H-1274. H.J. 949. |
2015-04-30 | House | Point of order raised amendment H-1274 not germane. H.J. 949. |
2015-04-30 | House | Amendment H-1271 withdrawn. H.J. 949. |
2015-04-30 | House | Ruled not germane amendment H-1275. H.J. 949. |
2015-04-30 | House | Point of order raised amendment H-1275 not germane. H.J. 949. |
2015-04-30 | House | Amendments H-1266, H-1269, and H-1268 withdrawn. H.J. 949. |
2015-04-30 | House | Amendments H-1273 and H-1267 lost. H.J. 948. |
2015-04-30 | House | Amendment H-1272 lost. H.J. 947. |
2015-04-30 | House | Speaker ruled point not well taken. H.J. 946. |
2015-04-30 | House | Point of order raised Rule 10, decorum in debate. H.J. 946. |
2015-04-29 | House | Amendments H-1274 and H-1275 filed. H.J. 942. |
2015-04-29 | House | Amendments H-1266, H-1267, H-1268, H-1269, H-1271, H-1272, and H-1273 filed. H.J. 941. |
2015-04-27 | House | Introduced, placed on Appropriations calendar. H.J. 923. |